Trustees THE LANTERN LEARNING TRUST (INNER CITY NORTH, LEEDS)
Charity number: 1160514

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rosebank Primary | Trustee | 03 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Pettman | Trustee | 21 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Blenheim Primary | Trustee | 06 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
ALICE SMITH | Trustee | 06 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
JILL HARLAND | Trustee | 06 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
MO DUFFY | Trustee | 26 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
BLENHEIM PRIMARY SCHOOL | Trustee | 26 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
Quarry Mount Primary | Trustee | 26 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
Brudenell Primary | Trustee | 26 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROSEBANK PRIMARY | Trustee | 26 February 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.