Governing document HATCH ENTERPRISE

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13 AUG 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 28/10/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/04/2015 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 15/05/2015 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 10 AUG 2016
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR YOUNG PEOPLE BETWEEN THE AGES OF 18-30 BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING COURSES AND OTHER SUPPORT, TO HELP BUILD SKILLS AND CONFIDENCE. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN SUBJECTS RELATING TO SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT AND THE PROTECTION, ENHANCEMENT AND REHABILITATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT. "SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT" MEANS DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.