Financial history LYTHAM PERFORMING ARTS FESTIVAL

Charity number: 1159967
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £6.43k £13 £5.12k £10.18k £6.23k
Total expenditure £6.50k £2.67k £5.55k £7.52k £8.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £300 N/A