THE YOUNG URBAN ARTS FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
YUAF aims to transform the lives of young people by strengthening their mental well-being, developing confidence, skills, self-esteem and building tools for resilience through urban arts creative activities and mental health educational programmes. YUAF works to reduce the risk of young people being vulnerable to diagnosed mental health conditions, drugs, gangs and abuse.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £69,000 from 9 government contract(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 12 December 2014: Standard registration
- LUAA (Working name)
- LONDON URBAN ARTS ACADEMY LIMITED (Previous name)
- THE LONDON URBAN ARTS ACADEMY LIMITED (Previous name)
- THE LONDON URBAN ARTS ACADEMY LTD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Belinda Ayanna Stewart | Trustee | 17 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adam Kamenetzky | Trustee | 28 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Salunke | Trustee | 30 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shekhar Karia | Trustee | 30 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sam-Pierre Nankivell | Trustee | 25 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £281.05k | £429.94k | £426.11k | £430.51k | £462.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £234.59k | £359.30k | £364.45k | £374.04k | £417.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £69.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £729 | £521 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/08/2008 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 23/07/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19/11/2014 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 29 JUN 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE ARTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN RELATION TO ENGAGING THE ARTS IN MEDIA, YOUTH WORK AND WORKFORCE DEVELOPMENT PRINCIPALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT AREA OF LONDON AND THE SOUTH EAST AND ITS ENVIRONS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (I) PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR INDIVIDUALS AND GROUPS TO ACCESS A RANGE OF ARTS AND MEDIA PROGRAMMES REGARDLESS OF THEIR BACKGROUND OR EXPERIENCE. (II) PROVIDING LEARNING, SUPPORT AND DEVELOPMENT PROGRAMMES TO YOUNG PEOPLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Amplify Ltd
27-33 Paul Street
LONDON
EC2A 4JU
- Phone:
- 07949007171
- Email:
- info@yuaf.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window