THE MOLDOVA PROJECT TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Moldova Project works with families living in poverty in in Moldova, Europe's poorest country, with the aim of improving their quality of life and helping them to become self-sufficient. This is done through a range of projects including sponsorship of families, education and training programmes, medical support and volunteering projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Moldova
Governance
- THE MOLDOVA PROJECT (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £78.85k | £93.88k | £73.55k | £102.32k | £49.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £75.92k | £76.19k | £84.91k | £84.98k | £61.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 July 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 28 September 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 28 September 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 15 MAY 2015 AMENDED ON 14 MAY 2016
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN VARIOUS VILLAGES IN THE COUNTRY OF MOLDOVA THROUGH: I. FAMILY SPONSORSHIP AND OTHER PROJECTS BY PROVIDING GRANTS ITEMS AND SERVICE TO INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO ASSIST THOSE IN NEED OR WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY; II. PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION TRAINING AND HEALTHCARE PROJECTS FOR PEOPLE OF ALL AGES; III. FUNDING OF PROJECTS DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF LIFE OF MOLDOVANS IN NEED FOR ACTIVITIES TO INCLUDE BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE RENOVATION OF HOUSING BUILDING RECREATIONAL GROUNDS AND BUILDING AND RENOVATING PUBLIC SPACES; IV. THE PLACEMENT AND ARRANGEMENT OF VOLUNTEERS TO VISIT MOLDOVA IN ORDER TO ASSIST THOSE IN NEED AND WITH THE AFOREMENTIONED PROJECTS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window