Financial history força - strength against cancer

Charity number: 1159552
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £19.18k £3.44k £5.03k £17.20k £91.85k
Total expenditure £14.58k £4.69k £6.66k £14.14k £27.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A