THE ABU-BAKAR MOSQUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Abu Bakar Mosque is located in Bradford BD3. The mosque's main object and its principal activity continues to be that of maintaining the mosque premises for prayers and worship and promoting the Islamic faith.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bradford City
Governance
- 27 April 1976: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AMANULLAH KHAN | Chair | 01 January 2000 |
|
|
||||
Ali Gohar Khan | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Umar Khan | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DILSHAD KHAN JP | Trustee |
|
||||||
AMANULLAH KHAN KHAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £127.91k | £59.38k | £130.70k | £150.92k | £128.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.14k | £31.49k | £55.74k | £66.27k | £77.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.09k | N/A | £3.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES DATED 5 FEBRUARY 1976
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE MUSLIM REGLIGION OR FAITH BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RELIGIOUS CEREMONY, EDUCATION AND INSTRUCTION OF THE MUSLIM FAITH TO MOHAMMEDAN PEOPLE AND CHILDREN WITHIN THE BRADFORD AREA ALSO TO RELIEVE MUSLIMS WHO ARE IN NEED BECAUSE OF SICKNESS, POVERTY OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
BRADFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
38 STEADMAN TERRACE
BRADFORD
WEST YORKSHIRE
BD3 9NB
- Phone:
- 01274668343
- Email:
- MASJIDABUBAKAR38@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window