Financial history SWIFT INCLUSIVE SPORT

Charity number: 1158851
Charity reporting is up to date (148 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £2.56k £2.56k £1.50k £4.32k £3.57k
Total expenditure £5.47k £1.91k £2.19k £4.25k £4.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A