FLIPSIDE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Producing the FlipSide festival to promote cultural exchange with Brazil and Latin America, to run literature, translation, music and art events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Suffolk
Governance
- 27 January 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Juliet Scott | Trustee | 17 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
GENEVIEVE CHRISTIE | Trustee | 09 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Stein | Trustee | 09 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Amy Stein | Trustee | 09 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Maloney | Trustee | 16 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
JEREMY SMITH | Trustee | 28 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dan Franklin | Trustee | 22 April 2017 |
|
|||||
HILARY BATTYE | Trustee | 01 March 2015 |
|
|||||
MARTIN BATTYE | Trustee | 20 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN CHRISTIE | Trustee | 20 September 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £90.94k | £15.26k | £7.00k | £3.82k | £5.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £77.44k | £15.26k | £9.06k | £9.37k | £8.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £55.26k | £12.71k | £3.26k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 17 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 17 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 28 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 28 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 27 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 27 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 18 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 18 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 12 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 12 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 27 Jan 2015 as amended on 10 Sep 2018
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF BRAZILIAN LIFE, CULTURE AND LANGUAGES IN ALL FORMS INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) LITERATURE AND MUSIC. (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN LITERATURE, LANGUAGE, MUSIC AND VISUAL ARTS, INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THE LITERATURE, LANGUAGES AND CULTURES OF OTHER COUNTRIES AND PEOPLES [BEYOND THE UNITED KINGDOM]. (C) TO ADVANCE THE ARTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND RUNNING OF ARTS-RELATED WORKSHOPS, EVENTS AND FESTIVALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Parham House Barn
Brick Lane
Parham
Woodbridge
IP13 9LQ
- Phone:
- 01728723321
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window