Accounts and annual returns CHESTER PRIDE

Charity number: 1161379
Charity reporting is up to date (142 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 November 2023 21 January 2025 142 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 November 2023 21 January 2025 142 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 November 2022 17 July 2024 320 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 November 2022 17 July 2024 320 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 November 2021 31 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 November 2021 31 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 November 2020 31 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 November 2020 31 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 November 2019 26 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 November 2019 26 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window