Financial history FAVELL GOSPEL HALL TRUST

Charity number: 1159430
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £235.06k £168.34k £161.10k £123.04k £176.98k
Total expenditure £84.30k £80.21k £96.34k £145.92k £177.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A