SPARC AUTISM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SPARC AUTISM provides assessment and diagnosis services for adults with autism or possible autism in the West Midlands.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
- Dudley
- Solihull
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 13 February 2015: Standard registration
- SPARC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr ASHOK ROY | Chair | 12 August 2014 |
|
|||||||
Kirsty Joanne Hawkes | Trustee | 08 December 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Jacqueline Thronicker | Trustee | 12 March 2018 |
|
|
||||||
GURDIP SINGH | Trustee | 14 December 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.83k | £46.15k | £45.60k | £79.80k | £1.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.30k | £50.69k | £52.35k | £69.12k | £8.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £49.83k | £46.15k | £45.60k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2023
(These accounts |
27 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21/02/2013 as amended on 10 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO ENGAGE IN ANY CHARITABLE ACTIVITY WHICH MAY IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR AND/OR RELIEVE ANY NEED OF PERSONS WITH MENTAL AND/OR PHYSICAL DISADVANTAGE IN PARTICULAR THROUGH AUTISTIC SPECTRUM CONDITIONS PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY ADVANCING THE HEALTH, CARE AND EDUCATION OF SUCH PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Autism West Midlands
Imperial Court
10 Sovereign Road
Kings Norton Business Centre
Kings Norton
Birmingh
- Phone:
- 01214507582
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window