BICMP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our purpose is to establish a world-class music institute at university level called 'Resonance', specialising in contemporary music performance, education, composition, entrepreneurship and production. The Trust's objects are the advancement of education for the public benefit by promoting and supporting education, teaching and research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 08 January 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Penn | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
DAVID DANIEL BARNARD | Trustee | 25 July 2015 |
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER CRONIN | Trustee | 25 July 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £5.07m | £2.27m | £646.51k | £440.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £263.53k | £217.42k | £401.74k | £1.11m | £1.21m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.07m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £0 | £2.26m | £371.13k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £5.07m | £2.00k | £231.25k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | £0 | £41.59k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £2.54k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £188.86k | £401.74k | £1.08m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £28.56k | £0 | £22.86k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | £7.20k | £4.20k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | |||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | |||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | |||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 11 November 2021 | 134 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 11 November 2021 | 134 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 13 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2019
(These accounts |
13 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01 AUG 2014
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROMOTING AND SUPPORTING EDUCATION IN, TEACHING OF, AND RESEARCH INTO CONTEMPORARY MUSIC AND PRODUCTION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CURRIE YOUNG LTD
10 KING STREET
NEWCASTLE
ST5 1EL
- Phone:
- 0300 555 1800
- Email:
- info@resonance-edu.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window