ST SWITHUN'S, BOURNEMOUTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St Swithun's is a new Anglican church in Bournemouth, planted from Holy Trinity Brompton in the Summer of 2014. The vision is 'to play our part in the re-evangelisation of the whole area and the transformation of its society'.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 08 July 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev TIMOTHY JOHN MATTHEWS | Chair | 06 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
Debi Matthews | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christine De Silva | Trustee | 08 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Chris Muir | Trustee | 07 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Festus Fatai Adedoyin | Trustee | 29 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Matthew John Brearley | Trustee | 29 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £861.76k | £549.59k | £635.67k | £545.03k | £476.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £608.20k | £757.19k | £582.18k | £557.12k | £456.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £849.16k | £530.08k | £611.99k | £517.39k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £10.32k | £10.82k | £8.36k | £9.80k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.22k | £8.38k | £13.56k | £15.24k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £1.06k | £314 | £1.76k | £2.60k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £608.03k | £754.50k | £575.29k | £552.52k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £168 | £2.69k | £6.89k | £4.61k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £1.55k | £670 | £670 | £670 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £70.00k | £0 | £89.00k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06 AUG 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 01/07/2015
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME SHALL DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Swithuns Church
Gervis Road
Bournemouth
BH1 3ED
- Phone:
- 01202241077
- Email:
- hello@lovechurch.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window