BUSYDAYS DAYCARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of premises where service users can attend and participate in educational or entertainment activities in a supportive environment. Preparation of items to sell in a charity shop onsite. Organised trips out in the community. Fortnightly operation of an evening social club which users can attend for a small fee. Fundraising by jumble salses, raffles and other items. Student placement.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 23 October 2023
Total income includes £18,102 from 4 government contract(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 11 September 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAT ANDREWARTHA | Chair | 31 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Lorena Jane Hall | Trustee | 21 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Jackson | Trustee | 23 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ANDREWARTHA BA.MSC.DM | Trustee | 31 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
CRAIG WHERRELL | Trustee | 31 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
HEIDI ADAMS | Trustee | 11 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
LUCY WHERRELL | Trustee | 06 September 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 23/10/2019 | 23/10/2020 | 23/10/2021 | 23/10/2022 | 23/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100.94k | £105.87k | £122.72k | £131.43k | £182.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £102.33k | £101.80k | £118.63k | £125.85k | £159.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £18.10k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £24.60k | £19.06k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 23 October 2023 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 October 2023 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 23 October 2022 | 24 January 2024 | 154 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 October 2022 | 24 January 2024 | 154 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 23 October 2021 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 October 2021 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 23 October 2020 | 14 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 October 2020 | 14 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 23 October 2019 | 07 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 October 2019 | 07 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 11 Sep 2014
Charitable objects
A) THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WITH A LEARNING DISABILITY IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF HELP AND SUPPORT FOR THEM AND FOR THEIR FAMILIES, DEPENDANTS AND CARERS, BY THE PROVISION DAYCARE FACILITIES AND ACTIVITIES. B) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR PEOPLE WHO HAVE NEED THEREOF BY REASON OF LEARNING DISABILITY WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Queens Park Community Hub
South Park
LINCOLN
LN5 8EW
- Phone:
- 07904563794
- Email:
- PAT.BUSYDAYS@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window