REACH AND TEACH FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Reach & Teach are a charitable community sports organisation who focus on using sport as a tool to develop positive social, academic, physical and vocational change in young people, particularly from disadvantaged backgrounds.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout London
Governance
- 19 November 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NHAMO SHIRE | Chair | 19 November 2015 |
|
|||||
Julius Joseph | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|||||
DARREN ALLAWAY | Trustee | 24 October 2014 |
|
|||||
CORY DEFOE | Trustee | 24 October 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2018 | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £78.67k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £75.40k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 8 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 8 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 373 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 373 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 07 July 2023 | 68 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 04 July 2023 | 430 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 04 July 2023 | 795 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 JUL 2014 AS AMENDED ON 16/10/2014
Charitable objects
1) THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY THE PROVISION OF OPPORTUNITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF BASKETBALL; AND 2) TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING IN LONDON BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES WITH PARTICULAR FOCUS ON BASKETBALL AS A MEANS OF: (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION; (C) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT; AND (D) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
3RD FLOOR
86-90 PAUL STREET
LONDON
EC2A 4NE
- Phone:
- 02038718338
- Email:
- helpside@reachandteach.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window