Trustees THE SILVERS' WORKSHOP
Charity number: 1159283

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Barry Fowler | Chair | 26 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Wilfrid Daniel Owen Mayes | Trustee | 27 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Edward Charles Burden | Trustee | 27 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stuart James Freebody | Trustee | 20 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Wilson Whittle | Trustee | 28 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Dewsnap | Trustee | 24 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY SMITH-CRALLAN | Trustee | 14 January 2017 |
|
|||||
David Catton | Trustee | 29 January 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.