Trustees GLANWERN GOSPEL HALL TRUST
Charity number: 1159426

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joel Brown | Trustee | 07 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Darren Phillip Brown | Trustee | 30 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
GAVIN MICHAEL SIMS | Trustee | 05 June 2012 |
|
|||||
Simon Andrew Rusling | Trustee | 27 September 2005 |
|
|||||
ANDREW ABERNETHIE | Trustee | 01 November 1993 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.