Financial history THE SAVOY EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity Number: 1161014
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.66m £1.31m £1.17m £1.30m £1.45m
Total expenditure £1.69m £3.16m £2.03m £2.18m £2.44m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.66m £1.31m £1.17m £1.30m £1.45m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.46m £2.93m £1.78m £1.95m £2.21m
Expenditure - Raising funds £228.97k £228.34k £246.35k £233.14k £233.49k
Expenditure - Governance £64.80k £62.34k £65.62k £96.36k £63.27k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.26m £2.74m £1.58m £1.69m £1.99m
Expenditure - Investment management £228.97k £228.34k £246.35k £233.14k £233.49k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0