NATIONAL FORUM FOR HEALTH AND WELL-BEING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
AIMS OF THE HEALTH MELA To engage and empower the community to lead a healthy lifestyle To provide free health checks, advice and personal counselling To encourage the public to make effective and informed use of health resources
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
Governance
- 02 December 2014: Standard registration
- LANCASHIRE GUJURAT HEALTH USERS FORUM (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Romesh Gupta | Chair | 20 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Russell Hogarth | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
SATYANMAN RAJBHANDARI | Trustee | 20 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
DR MARTIN MYERS MBE | Trustee | 20 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Robert Campbell | Trustee | 20 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
SARIFA KABIR | Trustee | 20 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
RAVI SHAH | Trustee | 20 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
MR ISHWER TAILOR MBE JP DL | Trustee | 17 May 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.00k | £257 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.20k | £229 | £5.08k | £3.47k | £572 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20 MAY 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, AND IN PARTICULAR, HEALTH PROFESSIONALS, IN ALL ASPECTS OF HEALTH B) TO PROMOTE GOOD MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY TO MINORITY ETHNIC GROUPS AND THOSE OTHERWISE IN NEED, TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITION OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 FRENCHWOOD AVENUE
PRESTON
PR1 4ND
- Phone:
- 01772466232
- Email:
- ishtailor@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window