ROMSEY CANCER SUPPORT CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Running an independent cancer support centre based in Romsey which provides emotional support for adults, including patients, family members and carers. The centre is open 5 days a week and services are provided free of charge. Our services include counselling, complementary therapies, meditation, information, clinics for finance, welfare and legal advice, and special interest groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
42 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
Governance
- 03 December 2014: CIO registration
- 07 December 2021: Funds received from 1029460 HEARING CONCERN ROMSEY
- JANE SCARTH HOUSE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Nigel Dickson | Chair | 15 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
David Hartley | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Cynthia Mary - Kim Fielder | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julian Gee | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP SCARTH | Trustee | 28 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
BRIDGET BROOK | Trustee | 28 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN JONES | Trustee | 28 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL STREET | Trustee | 28 August 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £232.40k | £230.40k | £215.81k | £256.13k | £297.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £207.73k | £178.61k | £206.60k | £220.25k | £249.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £65.12k | £5.43k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 03 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 03 Dec 2014 as amended on 10 Sept 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF PATIENTS, FAMILY AND FRIENDS WHO ARE EXPERIENCING OR HAVE EXPERIENCED CANCER BY PROVIDING A SUPPORT CENTRE IN ROMSEY TO PROVIDE FREE, CONFIDENTIAL, SUPPORT, COUNSELLING, MEDITATION, AROMATHERAPY, REFLEXOLOGY, MASSAGE AND AN INFORMATION LIBRARY AND BEFRIENDING SERVICE.
Area of benefit
IN ROMSEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Jane Scarth House
37a The Hundred
Romsey
Hampshire
SO51 8GE
- Phone:
- 01794830374
- Email:
- info@janescarthhouse.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window