Financial history THE HELIOS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1160233
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £188.58k £157.73k £134.04k £343.55k £198.57k
Total expenditure £186.07k £152.07k £150.20k £199.42k £226.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A