JUBILEE+

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity's Objects are to promote social inclusion for the public benefit, particularly but not exclusively by providing networking, education and training, to prevent people from becoming socially excluded focusing on ways and means of relieving the needs of those people who are socially excluded and assisting them to integrate into society, in accordance with Christian principles.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 January 2015: Standard registration
- JUBILEE PLUS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GRAHAM NEIL ANNS | Chair | 20 June 2013 |
|
|||||
Samuel John Ward | Trustee | 02 May 2025 |
|
|||||
Kathryn Jayne Osborn | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Susmitha Joanna Bleasdale | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew James Biggs | Trustee | 26 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kate Welch | Trustee | 29 July 2015 |
|
|||||
Dr ANDREW JOHN MCWILLIAM | Trustee | 20 June 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.27k | £121.84k | £107.92k | £125.54k | £306.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £75.11k | £108.39k | £88.00k | £117.24k | £186.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 26 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 26 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20 JUN 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24/11/2014 as amended on 15 Jan 2025
Charitable objects
The Charity's objects, being undertaken in accordance with Christian principles and practices and in such a way that demonstrates Christian faith, care and concern, and upholds the values of equality and justice, are as specifically restricted to the following: 1. To promote social inclusion for the public benefit by preventing people from becoming socially excluded, relieving the needs of those people who are socially excluded and assisting them to integrate into society, in particular but not exclusively by: undertaking and supporting research into factors that contribute to social exclusion and the most appropriate ways to mitigate these providing education, training, grants and services to individuals, charities or other organisations working to promote social inclusion hosting conferences and seminars to raise awareness of factors that contribute to social exclusion and the most appropriate ways to mitigate these seeking to influence the public, decision-makers, politicians or public servants in support of promoting social inclusion, and responding to consultations carried out by political parties in relation to promoting social inclusion insofar as it is legitimate for a charity to do so. For the purpose of this clause, 'socially excluded' means being excluded from society, or parts of society, as a result of one or more of the following factors: unemployment; financial hardship; youth or old age; ill health (physical or mental); substance abuse or dependency including alcohol or drugs; discrimination on the grounds of sex, race, disability, ethnic origin, religion, belief, creed, sexual orientation or gender reassignment; poor educational or skills attainment; relationship and family breakdown; poor housing (that is housing that does not meet basic habitable standards); crime (either as a victim of crime or as an offender rehabilitating into society). 2. The prevention or relief of poverty or financial hardship, in particular but not exclusively by: undertaking and supporting research into factors that contribute to the prevention or relief of poverty or financial hardship and the most appropriate ways to mitigate these providing education, training, grants and services to individuals, charities or other organisations working for the prevention or relief of poverty or financial hardship hosting conferences and seminars to raise awareness of factors that contribute to the prevention or relief of poverty or financial hardship and the most appropriate ways to mitigate these seeking to influence the public, decision-makers, politicians or public servants in support of the prevention or relief of poverty or financial hardship, and responding to consultations carried out by political parties in relation to the prevention or relief of poverty insofar as it is legitimate for a charity to do so. 3. To advance the Christian faith in accordance with the Ethos Statement appearing in the Schedule.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Hastings Centre
The Ridge
HASTINGS
East Sussex
TN34 2SA
- Phone:
- 01424 755990
- Email:
- admin@jubilee-plus.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window