SYDENHAM ARTS LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote, maintain and advance education, by encouragement of the arts and to develop new and existing opportunities for local residents and visitors to the area in order that they may experience the arts through active and passive participation, for the general public benefit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £8,371 from 3 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
- Surrey
- Throughout London
Governance
- 08 May 2015: Standard registration
- SYDENHAM ARTS (OR SA) (Working name)
- SYDENHAM ARTS FESTIVAL LIMITED (Previous name)
- SYDENHAM ARTS LTD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Jacques Launay | Trustee | 03 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Vanessa Croan | Trustee | 03 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Colleen Batson | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Felicity Clark | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
William James Rathbone | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon John Betts | Trustee | 15 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nitesh Patel | Trustee | 21 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Wilson | Trustee | 21 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Louise Manley | Trustee | 28 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jemilla Katherine Olufeko | Trustee | 23 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Hannah Scott | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ioanna Papageorgiou | Trustee | 28 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.59k | £56.90k | £40.42k | £58.02k | £43.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.80k | £46.69k | £41.53k | £49.48k | £49.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £18.53k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.36k | £8.50k | £3.03k | £18.53k | £8.37k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 29 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 29 January 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03/03/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/04/2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 16/10/2014 as amended on 24 Nov 2014
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE, PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE ARTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR PEOPLE WHO LIVE, WORK AND ARE EDUCATED IN SYDENHAM AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sydenham Centre
44A Sydenham Road
LONDON
SE26 5QF
- Phone:
- 02086993119
- Email:
- mike@sydenhamarts.co.uk
- Website:
-
WWW.SYDENHAMARTS.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window