THE ORWELL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVISION OF ANNUAL PRIZES, CULTURAL EVENTS AND DEBATES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 August 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
90 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 May 2015: CIO registration
- 01 April 2021: Funds received from 1156494 THE ORWELL YOUTH PRIZE
- THE ORWELL PRIZE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lord Ken Macdonald QC | Chair | 01 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sameer Padania | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Lincoln | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Armstrong | Trustee | 06 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Peck | Trustee | 06 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gavin Kelly | Trustee | 25 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
SU-MEI THOMPSON | Trustee | 10 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrew Williams | Trustee | 09 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH SICH | Trustee | 08 October 2015 |
|
|||||
Kathryn Anne Harvey | Trustee | 01 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Boyd Miles Tonkin | Trustee | 01 July 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/08/2020 | 30/08/2021 | 30/08/2022 | 30/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £203.73k | £167.54k | £191.38k | £127.83k | £205.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £158.56k | £157.00k | £127.45k | £174.90k | £235.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 August 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 August 2022 | 08 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2022 | 08 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 August 2021 | 07 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2021 | 07 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 August 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 07 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | 07 January 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 06 MAY 2015 AMENDED ON 04 APR 2017 AMENDED ON 15 FEB 2018 as amended on 13 May 2020 as amended on 13 May 2020 as amended on 13 May 2020
Charitable objects
The objects of the CIO are: 1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT INCLUDING WITHOUT LIMITATION THE PROVISION OF CULTURAL EVENTS, DEBATES, ONLINE RESOURCES, AND ANNUAL PRIZES. 2. THE PROMOTION OF THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Orwell Foundation
Institute of Advanced Studies
Wilkins Building
UCL
London
WC1E 6BT
- Phone:
- 02031081618
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window