CANOLFAN CLYDAU

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVDE A VENUE / COMMUNITY HALL FOR SOCIAL EVENTS FOR THE CLYDAU AREA AND BEYOND
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £9,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Pembrokeshire
Governance
- 30 September 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kevin Hunt | Trustee | 23 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Davies | Trustee | 22 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Eva Graham | Trustee | 22 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM BLETHYN | Trustee | 07 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Iwan Ward | Trustee | 07 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jason Pierre Redding | Trustee | 03 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Jannetta Ravell Redding | Trustee | 03 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marjorie Claire Sanders | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.85k | £37.79k | £4.29k | £24.04k | £23.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.99k | £11.47k | £17.82k | £21.27k | £38.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £23.00k | N/A | £4.85k | £9.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 February 2023 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 February 2023 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 30 Sep 2014
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF CLYDAU AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF AGE, SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS. NEW BOARD OF TRUSTEES FROM THE LOCAL COMMUNITY, TAKING ON A LONG TERM LEASE OF A NEW COMMUNITY BUILDING. AS PER THE OBJECTS THE TRUSTEES WILL MANAGE A FULLY ACCESSIBLE COMMUNITY BUILDING ON BEHALF OF THE LOCAL COMMUNITY THE BUILDING IS A FOCAL POINT OF THE COMMUNITY AND PROVIDES AN AFFORDABLE MEETING VENUE, CATERING FOR A RANGE OF USES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Canolfan Clydau
Tegryn
LLANFYRNACH
Dyfed
SA35 0BE
- Phone:
- 07490 097764
- Email:
- canolfanclydau@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window