DAARUL ARQAM EDUCATION & WELFARE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The organisation will benefit the general public and especially the younger members of the public The organisation will work with the community and provide lifelong learning services. Provide counselling services to the Muslim community and address youth problems At the moment this is greatly lacking in and around Preston. To guide the young people to become responsible citizens of the community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
Governance
- 19 February 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MUHAMMAD JAVED ALLY | Chair | 15 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
MOHMED JUNED BHIKHA | Trustee | 15 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
AAISHAH ALLY | Trustee | 15 August 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £265.96k | £149.93k | £209.22k | £315.21k | £247.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £74.60k | £82.03k | £73.64k | £60.21k | £570.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 February 2025 | 391 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 February 2025 | 391 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 March 2023 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 March 2023 | 41 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 March 2022 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 March 2023 | 408 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 April 2021 | 88 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 June 2021 | 134 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 19 Feb 2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR CHILDREN, ON ISLAM, THROUGH LEARNING AND TEACHING
Contact information
- Address:
-
283 Watling Street Road
Fulwood
Preston
PR2 8AB
- Phone:
- 07830078678
- Email:
- Molanajaved@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window