THE DIANE ABBOTT FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Diane Abbott Foundation undertakes research into the causes, and manifestations of, racial disparity in the United Kingdom. It brings together the work of the London Schools and the Black Child and Black Women Mean Business to provide training, mentorship, counselling and advocacy for black children in the school system and black business women.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 October 2015: Standard registration
- DAF (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEITH DAVIDSON | Trustee | 06 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
DIANE JULIE ABBOTT | Trustee | 06 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR HEIDI SAFIA MIRZA | Trustee | 06 December 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £748 | £879 | £564 | £646 | £508 | |
|
Total expenditure | £748 | £879 | £564 | £646 | £508 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 November 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06 DEC 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/04/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 01/10/2015
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (THE “OBJECTS”) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: 1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION 2. THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY 3. ANY OTHER OBJECT THAT IS CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE DIANE ABBOTT FOUNDATION
483 GREEN LANES
LONDON
N13 4BS
UNITED KINGDOM
N13 4BS
- Phone:
- 02086716874
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window