ALBERT HENRY WILLIAMS FOR A PARISH HALL AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support for Coronation Hall and Recreation Ground
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 14 May 1976: Standard registration
- TRUST OF ALBERT HENRY WILLIAMS (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CAROL ANN SAWYERS | Chair | 26 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
James Vaughan | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
PAUL GRENVILLE SAUNDERS | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Stuart David Hicks | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steve Morgan | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
DANIEL JAMES FORDHAM | Trustee | 15 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN JEFFREY WATKINS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £63 | £12 | £4 | £182 | £493 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 February 2022 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 22 FEBRUARY 1979
Charitable objects
THE UPKEEP, MAINTENANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PARISH HALL AND RECREATION GROUND BELONGING TO THE CHARITY AND FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF KINGSLAND.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF KINGSLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 The Wardens
Kingsland
LEOMINSTER
Herefordshire
HR6 9DP
- Phone:
- 01568 708171
- Email:
- clerk.kingslandpc@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window