DISABILITY ADVICE RESOURCE TEAM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve the needs of people with disabilities who live in Calderdale by providing advice and information to enhance equal access to work; state benefits; education; sport; leisure and all other facilities enjoyed by the community at large; and to educate the public towards equal rights and opportunities for people with disabilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Total income includes £25,000 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Calderdale
Governance
- 08 September 2015: CIO registration
- 12 October 2016: Funds received from 1000710 CALDERDALE DISABLED ADVICE RESOURCE TEAM
- 20 July 2023: Funds transferred to
- 20 July 2023: Removed (Removed by application)
- DART (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £105.24k | £65.94k | £43.86k | £46.10k | £42.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £93.04k | £76.76k | £47.21k | £46.64k | £42.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £24.05k | £24.23k | £25.00k | £43.31k | £25.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 08 Sep 2015
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF THOSE PERSONS WITH PHYSICAL DISABILITIES; LEARNING DIFFICULTIES; MENTAL ILLNESS; SENSORY IMPAIRMENT OR ANY OTHER DISABILITY OF WHATEVER NATURE OR CAUSE WHO LIVE IN CALDERDALE BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND INFORMATION TO ENHANCE EQUAL ACCESS TO WORK; STATE BENEFITS; EDUCATION; SPORT; LEISURE AND ALL OTHER FACILITIES ENJOYED BY THE COMMUNITY AT LARGE; AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC TOWARDS EQUAL RIGHTS AND OPPORTUNITIES FOR PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008].
Area of benefit
WHO LIVE IN CALDERDALE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window