LEIGH NEIGHBOURS PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of for the benefit of the public of urban regeneration in the area of Leigh bounded by Twist Lane, Atherleigh Way, Kirkhall Lane and Leigh Road/Market Street/King Street by a wide variety of activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £2,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Wigan
Governance
- 15 April 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil Fallows | Trustee | 31 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cllr Dane Kevan Anderton | Trustee | 31 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Jane Ratcliffe | Trustee | 21 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Sharrock | Trustee | 21 April 2020 |
|
|||||
HELEN AHMED | Trustee | 15 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £102.84k | £306.39k | £53.47k | £124.66k | £65.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £100.16k | £99.26k | £75.04k | £67.40k | £75.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.14k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | £2.00k | £2.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 15 Apr 2015 as amended on 30 Apr 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE "THE PROMOTION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF URBAN REGENERATION IN THE AREA OF LEIGH BOUNDED BY TWIST LANE, ATHERLEIGH WAY, KIRKHALL LANE AND LEIGH ROAD/MARKET STREET/KING STREET BY THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE, AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE: (B) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE OR BUSINESS ADVICE OR CONSULTANCY IN ORDER TO PROVIDE TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE IN CASES OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED THROUGH HELP: (I) IN SETTING UP THEIR OWN BUSINESS, OR (II) TO EXISTING BUSINESSES: (C) THE PROVISION OF HOUSING FOR THOSE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF HOUSING IN THE PUBLIC SECTOR OR IN CHARITABLE OWNERSHIP PROVIDED THAT SUCH POWER SHALL NOT EXTEND TO RELIEVING ANY LOCAL AUTHORITIES OR OTHER BODIES OF A STATUTORY DUTY TO PROVIDE OR IMPROVE HOUSING: (D) THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE OR THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES: (E) THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND PREVENTION OF CRIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sacred Heart RC School
34 Windermere Road
LEIGH
Lancashire
WN7 1UX
- Phone:
- 01942 674226
- Email:
- info@lnpb.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window