HARVARD GLOBAL UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of education for the public benefit in particular, but not exclusively, by the promotion of study and research into subjects including sustainable development with the useful results of such study and research disseminated to the public at large.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£110k to £120k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 April 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sean Caron | Trustee | 03 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
JAMES VICTOR BAKER | Trustee | 25 July 2014 |
|
|||||
JOSEPH HUGH O'REGAN | Trustee | 25 July 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £202.25k | £687.44k | £357.73k | £293.32k | £284.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £223.68k | £3.12m | £357.73k | £293.32k | £284.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £687.44k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £3.12m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £8.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 06 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 06 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 19 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 19 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 05 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 05 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 21 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 21 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25 JUL 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17/03/2015 as amended on 07 Aug 2018
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ('OBJECTS') ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROMOTION OF STUDY AND RESEARCH INTO SUBJECTS INCLUDING SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT (INCLUDING THE CONNECTIONS BETWEEN URBANIZATION, REGENERATION, GOVERNMENTAL POLICY, QUALITY OF LIFE, AND THE HEALTH OF CITIZENS), PROVIDED THAT THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH STUDY AND RESEARCH ARE DISSEMINATED TO THE PUBLIC AT LARGE. THROUGHOUT THESE ARTICLES, “SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT” MEANS DEVELOPMENT THAT MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
71 Queen Victoria Street
London
EC4V 4BE
- Phone:
- +1-617-496-1889
- Email:
- notices@harvardglobal.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window