LETS GROW PRESTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide training/resources to help community groups to manage and maintain green spaces Provide a network of communication and support for community environmental groups, activities and people Promote an environment of skill sharing, volunteering and sharing of resources encourage the formation of new community based groups promote and publicise community environmental activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
Total income includes £3,150 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Lancashire
Governance
- 29 October 2014: CIO registration
- PEF (Working name)
- PRESTON ENVIRONMENTAL FORUM (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jeanette Smalley | Trustee | 31 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Clare Watson | Trustee | 30 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Gillies Mrs | Trustee | 18 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen Jane Wardle | Trustee | 09 August 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75.52k | £118.42k | £118.42k | £149.52k | £211.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £77.21k | £79.24k | £79.24k | £117.87k | £183.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £31.50k | £42.15k | £3.15k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 23 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 23 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 30 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 30 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 29 OCT 2014 AMENDED ON 19/02/2016 as amended on 21 Oct 2019 as amended on 21 Apr 2020 as amended on 06 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
1. IMPROVE AND MAINTAIN FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF PRESTON (Defined as the PR postcodes) AND ITS VISITORS, THE GARDENS, LANDSCAPED AREAS, OPEN SPACES, PLAYING FIELDS, PLAYGROUNDS AND RECREATIONAL AMENITY SPACES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE PUBLIC BY PROVIDING RESOURCES AND SUPPORT WHICH ARE ANCILLARY TO THOSE PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL AUTHORITY. 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF SUCH PLACES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE HEALTH AND WELL-BEING, AND DEVELOPING THE SELF CONFIDENCE, SOCIAL SKILLS, WORK SKILLS AND HORTICULTURAL SKILLS OF THE INHABITANTS OF PRESTON (DEFINED AS THE PR POSTCODES) AND ITS VISITORS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Bowling Pavilion
Ashton Park
Preston
Preston
- Phone:
- 07535836364
- Email:
- letsgrowpreston@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window