Trustees CENTREPIECES CIO

Charity number: 1160300
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mike Ellsmore Chair 05 May 2015
None on record
Harriet Jane Louth Trustee 13 February 2025
None on record
Frederick Clough Trustee 02 October 2024
None on record
Sujatha Thaladi Trustee 17 July 2024
None on record
Sharanjit Sanger Trustee 15 April 2024
None on record
Rashikkha Ra Iyer Trustee 19 July 2023
None on record
Georgina Lonergan Trustee 20 January 2023
None on record
Sally Catherine Macgregor Trustee 01 June 2022
None on record
Jenny Watson Trustee 20 April 2016
None on record
Britta Von Zweigbergk Trustee 05 May 2015
None on record