THE PENSFORD, PUBLOW AND THE STANTONS COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust benefits people and organisations in the local government parishes of Publow with Pensford, and Stanton Drew.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Bath And North East Somerset
Governance
- 02 February 2015: CIO registration
- PPSCT (Working name)
- THE PENSFORD WITH PUBLOW AND THE STANTONS COMMUNITY TRUST (Previous name)
- THE PENSFORD,PUBLOW AND THE STANTONS COMMUNITY TRUST (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew George Aldridge Hillman | Chair | 02 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Norman Heckington | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eilish McNickle | Trustee | 26 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Jeremy Finn | Trustee | 26 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ann Richardson | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Derek John Winstone | Trustee | 25 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
SUE OSBORNE | Trustee | 02 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
TONY HEAFORD | Trustee | 02 February 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.12k | £29.51k | £13.48k | £21.39k | £20.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.28k | £17.07k | £9.59k | £23.89k | £5.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 06 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 02 Feb 2015
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER SUCH PURPOSES WHICH MAY BE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT BY THE MAKING OF GRANTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS FO THE PARISHES OF PUBLOW WITH PENSFORD AND STANTON DREW.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BIRCHWOOD HOUSE
BIRCHWOOD LANE
PENSFORD
BRISTOL
BS39 4NG
- Phone:
- 01761490324
- Email:
- andrewhillman@btinternet.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window