PROJECT GAMBIA TRUST - RIDGEWOOD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Working alongside Gambian schools and communities we go beyond handouts to provide the education, support and funding needed for people to become independent, and find a sustainable solution to poverty.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Birmingham City
- Dudley
- Staffordshire
- Wolverhampton
- Worcestershire
- The Gambia
Governance
- 26 January 2015: Standard registration
- PROJECT GAMBIA TRUST RIDGEWOOD (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Kevin Hodt | Chair | 21 December 2014 |
|
|||||
Georgia Mae Wilkinson | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alex John Smith | Trustee | 09 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Veronica Bridgewater | Trustee | 20 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
STEVEN DAVIS | Trustee | 21 December 2014 |
|
|||||
BEVERLEY HODT | Trustee | 21 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE ANNE HILL | Trustee | 21 December 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £126.30k | £25.13k | £24.04k | £144.32k | £170.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £98.87k | £28.51k | £24.34k | £122.52k | £169.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 14 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 14 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 14 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 14 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 19 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 19 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18/12/2014
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE AND SUPPORT THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING OF PEOPLE IN ALL FORMAL LEVELS OF EDUCATION IN GAMBIA IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC SPECIFICALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THOSE INDIVIDUALS ASSOCIATED TO RIDGEWOOD HIGH SCHOOL IN ISSUES FACING THOSE IN THE GAMBIA. (B) TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY TO INDIVIDUALS LIVING IN THE GAMBIA BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO THOSE IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 CLARK STREET
STOURBRIDGE
DY8 3UF
- Phone:
- 077454708200
- Email:
- projectgambia1@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window