Deal Area Foodbank & Pantry

Charity number: 1158590
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Deal Area Foodbank & Pantry provides emergency food aid to individuals and families located in Deal and the surrounding villages including Sandwich & Aylsham. Donated food is taken to a warehouse for storage and stock control measures. Clients attend local distribution points to exchange a voucher issued by one of over 30 agencies and partner organisations for a 3 day emergency supply of food.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £310,772
Total expenditure: £246,074

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 December 2012: Standard registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • DAEF (Working name)
  • DEAL AREA EMERGENCY FOODBANK (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CHRISTOPHER STRINGER Chair 21 November 2022
None on record
Paul Green Trustee 20 May 2021
None on record
Theti Angelika Doggett Trustee 20 May 2021
AYLESHAM AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY WORKSHOP TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £144.56k £237.51k £201.13k £296.10k £310.77k
Total expenditure £98.70k £145.13k £125.34k £239.49k £246.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £9.56k £7.59k £40.00k £82.00k £97.50k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 23 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 23 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 26 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 26 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 25 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 JUL 2012 AS AMENDED ON 10/12/2012
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN THE DEAL AREA IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING EMERGENCY FOOD SUPPLIES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Area of benefit
Registration history
  • 12 December 2012 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Unit C/4
Deal Enterprise Centre
Western Road
DEAL
CT14 6PJ
Phone:
01304728428
Website:

dealarea.foodbank.org.uk