Financial history FRIENDS OF YORK WALLS

Charity number: 1159300
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £14.73k £7.12k £22.80k £7.18k £9.13k
Total expenditure £13.19k £2.32k £7.72k £7.16k £18.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £2.50k £17.43k N/A N/A