ODD EYES THEATRE

Charity Number: 1159836
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Odd Eyes Theatre opens communication across cultures and enables social inclusion with theatre productions, training and community events.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £91,390
Total expenditure: £52,594

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Camden
  • Hackney
  • Islington
  • Tower Hamlets
  • Wandsworth

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 January 2015: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Diego Trucco Chair 14 May 2022
None on record
Simrun Kaur-Rathore Trustee 14 September 2023
None on record
Dr Yasanji Chamara Ratnaike Trustee 14 September 2023
None on record
Sara-Jane Kaba Trustee 25 May 2023
None on record
Flora Herberich Trustee 10 January 2017
None on record
LETIZIA MELE BA Trustee 07 January 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £22.19k £27.95k £59.45k £66.71k £91.39k
Total expenditure £25.23k £20.70k £54.48k £73.54k £52.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £12.17k £19.59k £30.72k £56.54k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 02 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 02 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 20 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 20 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 20 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 06 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 26 May 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
UNIT 4
THE ENERGY CENTRE
BOWLING GREEN WALK
LONDON
N1 6AL
Phone:
02089863721