Financial history ABC AFRICA: A BETTER CHANCE FOR CHILDREN

Charity number: 1158953
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.54k £3.00k £4.99k £7.65k £4.63k
Total expenditure £4.19k £5.18k £1.18k £5.57k £4.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A