SOUTH DOWNS GOSPEL HALL TRUST

Charity number: 1162400
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Religious activities. Other charitable purposes.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £189,807
Total expenditure: £76,932

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire
  • Surrey
  • West Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 June 2015: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Broderick John Knappett Chair 10 March 2016
None on record
Shane Lee White Trustee 30 November 2019
None on record
Darrell Anderson Trustee 30 November 2019
None on record
Mr Patrick Tennent Trustee 10 March 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £201.04k £115.04k £101.79k £96.17k £189.81k
Total expenditure £29.44k £17.85k £878.05k £40.03k £76.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 11 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 11 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 15 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 15 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 21 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 21 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 29 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 29 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 29 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 29 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
SOMERVILLE
BRIDLE CLOSE
GRAYSHOTT
HINDHEAD
GU26 6EA
Phone:
03455054444
Website:

No information available