Animal Welfare Suffolk

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The care and relief from suffering of domestic animals. The centre takes in stray animals and treats animals for people on benefit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Suffolk
Governance
- 11 December 2014: CIO registration
- 28 October 2015: Funds received from 209074 IPSWICH AND DISTRICT ANIMAL WELFARE CENTRE
- IDAWC (Working name)
- IPSWICH AND DISTRICT ANIMAL WELFARE CENTRE CIO (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Natasha Eleanor Maine | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Flint | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Chaplin | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lydia Dorthy Carys Williams | Trustee | 24 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mark Stuart Jeffrey | Trustee | 24 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Cindy Joy Chaplin | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ben Chaplin | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £148.42k | £139.80k | £85.82k | £166.13k | £145.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £61.09k | £84.34k | £112.17k | £134.53k | £167.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 07 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 07 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 06 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 06 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 09 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 09 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 11 Dec 2014 as amended on 08 Aug 2022
Charitable objects
PROMOTION OF ANIMAL WELFARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND THE RELIEF OF DISTRESS, SUFFERING AND SICKNESS OF ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION, WITH SPECIAL ATTENTION TO DOMESTIC PETS BY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE CARE AND HUMANE DESTRUCTION (WHERE NECESSARY) OF UNWANTED ANIMALS AND MAINTENANCE OF A SUITABLE CENTRE OR CENTRES FOR THE RECEPTION AND TREATMENT OF ANIMALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
181 Cauldwell Hall Road
IPSWICH
IP4 5DA
- Phone:
- 01473727496
- Website:
-
animalwelfaresuffolk.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window