MAHOUTS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a family run foundation working to improve welfare with captive Elephants working in the tourism industry. We work in Thailand, Europe, also raising awareness in the UK collaborating with tour companies and educating tourists visiting Asia. Active in both rescues and on going research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Thailand
Governance
- 23 October 2014: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SARAH BLAINE | Chair | 30 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Mullen | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
David Mullen | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Paul Haidon | Trustee | 27 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
TIM HODGETTS | Trustee | 30 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr FELIX BLAINE | Trustee | 30 September 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £408.49k | £75.01k | £34.59k | £73.83k | £81.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £157.85k | £137.57k | £59.97k | £114.72k | £134.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 15 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 15 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 26 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 26 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 19 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 19 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 23 Oct 2014
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ELEPHANTS BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR ELEPHANTS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ELEPHANT WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ELEPHANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Harran
Peopleton
Pershore
WR10 2EA
- Phone:
- 07787565302
- Email:
- sarah@mahouts.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window