SQUISHY

Charity number: 1160540
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We are a new grant making charity. Please see our website for details.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £82,693
Total expenditure: £5,860

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 February 2015: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SUSAN JOY ROBINSON Trustee 30 August 2014
HARVEST FIELDS HOMES
Received: On time
QUOTHQUAN HOMES
Received: On time
QUOTHQUAN TRUST
Received: On time
YIELD LAND TRUST
Received: On time
HARVEST FIELDS COMMUNITY CHURCH
Received: On time
HARVEST FIELDS CENTRE LTD
Received: On time
ED ROBINSON Trustee 30 August 2014
HARVEST FIELDS COMMUNITY CHURCH
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £9.69k £2.44k £1.49k £145 £82.69k
Total expenditure £7.75k £5.71k £5.71k £16.87k £5.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 01 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 01 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 January 2024 92 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 11 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
149 Harvest Fields Way
SUTTON COLDFIELD
West Midlands
B75 5TJ
Phone:
07774477944
Website:

squishycharitabletrust.org.uk