Accounts and annual returns GREEN SHOOTS EDUCATION UK CIO
Charity number: 1163008
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 11 November 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 11 November 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 11 November 2018 | 24 February 2020 | 166 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 November 2018 | 24 February 2020 | 166 days late | |
Annual return | 11 November 2017 | 11 September 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 November 2017 | 11 September 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 11 November 2016 | 11 September 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 November 2016 | 11 September 2017 | On Time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window