GRAVESEND CRICKET, LAWN TENNIS AND BOWLING CLUB (1960) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity the promotion of community participation in healthy recreation for the residents of Gravesend and surrounding areas by the provision of facilities for the playing of cricket, bowling and tennis.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 07 April 2015: Standard registration
- GRAVESEND CRICKET, LAWN TENNIS AND BOWLING CLUB (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LAKHBIR SINGH PAHAL | Chair | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
John Dennis Best | Trustee | 28 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Ian Dodd | Trustee | 05 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
IAN QUINTON | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA ROSE PURDY | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY JOHN HANCE | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.75k | £60.49k | £112.34k | £117.31k | £140.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £74.89k | £47.31k | £100.99k | £124.89k | £119.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £500 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.19k | £8.18k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09/12/1960 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/08/2014 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 30/09/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05/03/2015
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE RESIDENTS OF GRAVESEND AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF CRICKET, BOWLING AND TENNIS
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 STICKENS LANE
EAST MALLING
WEST MALLING
ME19 6BT
- Phone:
- 07979805580
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window