QUBA TRUST


Charity overview
Regulatory alerts
- The Charity Commission has published a report Open in new window on its inquiry into the charity
Activities - how the charity spends its money
N/A
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 24 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 December 2014: Standard registration
- AL - QUBA TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sehrish Khan | Trustee | 19 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rida Meraj | Trustee | 19 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Muhammad Abdullah | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 24/01/2020 | 24/01/2021 | 24/01/2022 | 24/01/2023 | 24/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £135.42k | £329.61k | £944.25k | £76.14k | £4.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £141.89k | £230.38k | £845.36k | £196.42k | £84.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £5.50k | £5.10k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £944.25k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £817.71k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £27.65k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £300 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 24 January 2024 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 24 January 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 January 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 24 January 2022 | 28 March 2023 | 124 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 January 2022 | 10 July 2023 | 228 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 24 January 2021 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 January 2021 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 24 January 2020 | 01 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 January 2020 | 24 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24 JAN 2014 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 20/07/2015
Charitable objects
A)THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER IN THE FORM OF SERVICES (OR OTHER MEANS DEEMED SUITABLE) FOR PERSONS, BODIES, ORGANISATIONS AND/OR COUNTRIES. B)TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF MEETINGS, LECTURES [PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS] PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON AND TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE ISLAMIC RELIGION. THE TRUSTEES MUST USE THE INCOME AND MAY USE THE CAPITAL OF THE CHARITY IN PROMOTING THE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 Mayne Avenue
LUTON
LU4 9LS
- Phone:
- 07396869195
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window