Financial history THE DONALD FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1159424
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 25/09/2020 25/09/2021 25/09/2022 25/09/2023 25/09/2024
Total gross income £13.80k £4.17k £3.01k £14.21k £16.02k
Total expenditure £17.34k £41.31k £15.92k £15.66k £27.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A