ABRAHAM'S CHILDREN IN CRISIS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities this year have been to support children who are living in the Holy Land by providing relief for those who currently may not be receiving help, who are in critical need because of extreme financial hardship, physical or mental illness / disability, abandonment, the death of one or both parents or family breakdown.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Israel
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
Governance
- 13 November 2014: Standard registration
- ACIC (Working name)
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAN PETER MILLS | Chair | 08 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Pearl Saddington | Trustee | 19 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
ADAM JAMES BUSHNELL | Trustee | 08 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.64k | £23.74k | £21.79k | £19.49k | £37.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.73k | £21.65k | £24.83k | £19.56k | £34.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 28 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 28 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 08 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 07 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 17 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 08 FEB 2014
Charitable objects
FOR THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE RELIEF OF PHYSICAL OR MENTAL ILLNESS FOR CHILDREN UNDER THE AGE OF 22 YEARS, PERMANENTLY LIVING IN THE HOLY LAND (ISRAEL AND THE OCCUPIED PALESTINIAN TERRITORIES) AND WHO ARE IN CRITICAL NEED, BY REASON OF ILL HEALTH, EXTREME FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE BY: MAKING GRANTS TO INDIVIDUALS AND ORGANISATIONS THROUGH SPONSORSHIP OF INDIVIDUAL CHILDREN TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF WELFARE, EDUCATION AND MEDICAL CARE.
Area of benefit
LIVING IN THE HOLY LAND (ISRAEL AND THE OCCUPIED PALESTINIAN TERRITORIES)
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 4
Stonefield House
Church Lane
Boroughbridge
YORK
YO51 9BA
- Phone:
- 07464238733
- Email:
- ianmills1959@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window