RAMSGATE (HERITAGE REGENERATION) TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To develop the Heritage projects in the Ramsgate catchment area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
72 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
Governance
- 09 December 2016: Standard registration
- RHRT (Working name)
- RAMSGATE (HERITAGE REGENERATION)TRUST LTD. (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Malcolm Whitworth Story | Chair | 20 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Terrie Elaine Wheatley-Ward | Trustee | 21 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Robert William Warren | Trustee | 08 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Anne Aris | Trustee | 03 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Courtney Smith | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Thomas Pankhurst | Trustee | 19 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Colin Edward Aris | Trustee | 18 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Max Roberts Streatfield | Trustee | 16 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £131.34k | £95.98k | £205.23k | £209.38k | £236.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £95.10k | £109.07k | £167.77k | £204.79k | £227.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £32.71k | £5.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 08 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 08 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 05 September 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 05 September 2021 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 22 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 29 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22 SEP 0216 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 09 APR 2019 as amended on 30 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE COMPANY ARE TO CONSERVE AND REGENERATE ANY LAND AND BUILDINGS IN RAMSGATE AND DOCUMENTS AND ARCHIVES, EPHEMERA AND ARTEFACTS, OF HISTORICAL, CULTURAL OR ARCHITECTURAL INTEREST (AND, IN PARTICULAR, LAND AND BUILDINGS WHICH ARE NO LONGER USED FOR THEIR ORIGINAL PURPOSE OR ARE AT RISK OF CLOSURE OR DEMOLITION) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY DEVELOPING THE SAME AS COMMUNITY ASSETS AND ENCOURAGING COMMUNITY ENTERPRISE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
RAMSGATE HERITAGE REGERATION TRUST
Ramsgate Tunnels
Marina Esplanade
RAMSGATE
CT11 8FH
- Phone:
- 01843588123
- Email:
- admin@ramsgatetunnels.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window